Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14417 Week
» 67433 Month
» 186960 Year
» 3213813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
545 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7545 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5473 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65473 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G73 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/03/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1913 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 545 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7545 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5473 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65473 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65473 |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|