Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 511 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7194 Week
» 18240 Month
» 18240 Year
» 1683616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1151 m/e 09/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8151 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5501 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 65501 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1609/1900
J17 (0-6-0)04/1929
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 09/1900
Withdrawal Wed 29/01/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1900
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 16/02/1952
31B March 4w/e 18/05/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 29/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   on 29/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1151
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8151    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5501    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65501    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
29/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65501    

prev prev