Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 506 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7189 Week
» 18235 Month
» 18235 Year
» 1683611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1159 m/e 11/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8159 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5509 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65509 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1611/1900
J17 (0-6-0)05/1929
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 11/1900
Withdrawal Mon 27/01/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys
Information Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1900
MC Melton Constable on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32F Yarmouth Beach 5w/e 16/02/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/07/1953
32G Melton Constable 4w/e 23/01/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 27/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC MC Melton Constable on 02/05/1947
ALLOC 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   on 27/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1159
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8159    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5509    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65509    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
27/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65509    

prev prev