Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1780 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19583 Week
» 72599 Month
» 192126 Year
» 3218979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1162 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8162 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5512 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65512 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/12/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1162 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8162 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5512 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65512 |
|
|
11/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65512 |
|
|