Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1502 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14908 Week
» 67924 Month
» 187451 Year
» 3214304 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1166 |
m/e |
01/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8166 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5516 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65516 |
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YB |
Yarmouth Beach |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1166 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8166 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5516 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65516 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65516 |
|
|