Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15688 Week
» 68704 Month
» 188231 Year
» 3215084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1188 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8188 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5538 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65538 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P52 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/04/1959 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
27/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
22/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1188 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8188 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5538 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65538 |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65538 |
|
|