Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2175 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15581 Week
» 68597 Month
» 188124 Year
» 3214977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1196 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8196 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5546 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65546 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/01/1960 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1902 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/01/1952 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1196 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8196 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5546 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65546 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65546 |
|
|