Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1198 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8198 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5548 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65548 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
w/e |
24/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1960 |
G.E. Dieselisation |
Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. |
SLS/196101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1198 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8198 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5548 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
24/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65548 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65548 |
|
|