Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17045 Week
» 70061 Month
» 189588 Year
» 3216441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1199 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8199 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5549 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65549 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 11/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/12/1960 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1902 |
KL |
|
Kings Lynn |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1199 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8199 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5549 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65549 |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65549 |
|
|