Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1202 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8202 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5552 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65552 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P54 |
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 10/01/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
33A |
Plaistow |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/01/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1202 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8202 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5552 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65552 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/01/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65552 |
|
|