Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1340 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19143 Week
» 72159 Month
» 191686 Year
» 3218539 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1247 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8247 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4647 |
|
04/1946 |
British Railways |
64647 |
|
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
J18 |
Company History |
LNER/BR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E72 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 30/03/1960 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 4 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1912 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
31C |
|
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
04/07/1959 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/03/1960 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1936 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1247 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8247 |
|
|
02/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4647 |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64647 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64647 |
|
|