Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 769 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14175 Week
» 67191 Month
» 186718 Year
» 3213571 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1260 |
m/e |
12/1917 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8260 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4660 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64660 |
|
12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H80 |
To Service |
During 12/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/08/1960 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1260 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8260 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4660 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64660 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64660 |
|
|