Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16429 Week
» 69445 Month
» 188972 Year
» 3215825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1264 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8264 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4664 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64664 |
|
12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H80 |
To Service |
During 09/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1264 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8264 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4664 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64664 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64664 |
|
|