Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2279 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20082 Week
» 73098 Month
» 192625 Year
» 3219478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1279 |
m/e |
09/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8279 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4684 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64684 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M87 |
To Service |
During 09/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/06/1960 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1279 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8279 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4684 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64684 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
27/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64684 |
|
|