Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 862 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14268 Week
» 67284 Month
» 186811 Year
» 3213664 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1315 |
m/e |
06/1887 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5027 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65027 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1905 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1928 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1887 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1315 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 12.87 |
|
|
06/1905 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
02/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5027 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65027 |
|
|
27/02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65027 from York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (South Blyth) |
|
|