Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18240 Week
» 71256 Month
» 190783 Year
» 3217636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
899 |
m/e |
06/1889 |
North Eastern Railway (Renum) |
1507 |
m/e |
08/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5039 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65039 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
18.89 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1889 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/11/1958 off Tyne Dock (52H) |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAL |
Malton |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
MA |
|
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1910 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1910 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1889 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 899 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 18.89 |
|
|
08/1889 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1507 |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5039 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65039 |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (MAL) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
26/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65039 from Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|