Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
778 |
m/e |
06/1889 |
North Eastern Railway (Renum) |
1512 |
m/e |
08/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5042 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65042 |
on |
16/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
26.89 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1889 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/07/1954 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52CREED |
|
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/07/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1907 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1907 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1954 |
Scrapped NER engines |
A number of N.E.R. engines have been cut up recently. They include D20 Nos. 62388, 62392; J77 Nos. 68422 an 68401 (this engine has round cab windows and vacuum ejector); G5 No. 67288; J7 No. 8256; A7 No. 69776 and J21 No. 65042/68/75. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1889 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 778 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 26.89 |
|
|
08/1889 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1512 |
|
|
10/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
10/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5042 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) |
|
|
16/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65042 |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
07/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
07/07/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65042 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|