Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4889 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20501 Week
» 119146 Month
» 321810 Year
» 3348663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
312 |
m/e |
09/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5061 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65061 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
31.90 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/05/1958 off Tweedmouth (52D) |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1907 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1907 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1925 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 312 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 31.90 |
|
|
09/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
09/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
04/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5061 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65061 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
12/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65061 from Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
06/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|