Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 289 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18092 Week
» 71108 Month
» 190635 Year
» 3217488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
26 |
m/e |
01/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5070 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65070 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1910 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1929 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
Darlington Works |
Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. |
SLS/195306 |
08/10/1955 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. |
SLS/195512 |
31/07/1957 |
Gateshead MPD |
At the latter end of July, J72 68727 fitted with a shorter chimney than is usual on the class, was observed standing dead on the sidings to the south of the running shed. At the end of one of the sidings, J21 65070 was standing minus dome cover and tender. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 26 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 136 |
|
|
04/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
01/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5070 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65070 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
05/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65070 from Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|