Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19124 Week
» 72140 Month
» 191667 Year
» 3218520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
570 |
m/e |
06/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5088 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
65088 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5.70 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/11/1955 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
w/e |
20/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
52CHex |
|
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1908 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
07/1908 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1914 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 570 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 5.70 |
|
|
07/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
07/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
09/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5088 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65088 |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
21/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65088 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|