Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4062 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22973 Week
» 87927 Month
» 290591 Year
» 3317444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1590 |
m/e |
02/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5103 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65103 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
9.92 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 05/12/1958 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
19/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/12/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1910 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1910 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1915 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/12/1952 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
Darlington: No. 76020 is working from Bank Top Shed, and we hear that 76021/2 are at Hull. No. 76023 worked an up goods arriving Darlington 2.30 p.m. and returned north at 4 p.m. on 12th January. It is proposed to try 76020 on a two-trip Saltburn passenger job when run in. Nos. 78001/2 worked the 8.25 p.m. Darlington-Kirkby goods one day (or night!) last week, but both were shy steamers and broke no records climbing Stainmore. The Royal train, last Saturday, was worked by 'A.1' No. 60131 Osprey, and No. 60075 St. Frusquin stood pilot at Bank Top, cleaned up in the old N.E.R. tradition. No. 65103 ('J.21') is running two trips, Darlington-Penrith, daily with the Bank Top passenger turns, quite a nice mileage for this loco., but she is kept in excellent fettle. Another consistent performer here is No. 61353, the Rugby Plant 'B.1.' She is regularly on a Darlington-Newcastle-Leeds-Darlington job, double manned. |
SLS/195303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1590 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 9.92 |
|
|
09/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
09/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
09/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5103 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby Stephen (KBY) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65103 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
19/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
05/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65103 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|