Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3984 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17390 Week
» 70406 Month
» 189933 Year
» 3216786 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1806 |
m/e |
04/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5117 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65117 |
m/e |
02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6.94 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/02/1959 off Tyne Dock (52H) |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
08/10/1955 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. |
SLS/195512 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1894 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1806 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 6.94 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5117 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
02/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65117 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
23/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65117 from Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
03/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|