Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14537 Week
» 67553 Month
» 187080 Year
» 3213933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1982 |
m/e |
11/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5657 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65657 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/11/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Diagram "398" boiler fitted |
03/1931 |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
11/1944 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1898 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1982 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Diagram "398" boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1931 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1939 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
10/1939 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
11/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5657 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Borough Gardens (BOR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65657 |
|
|
26/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65657 |
|
|