Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 318 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6245 Week
» 4983 Month
» 419304 Year
» 1640869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1988 m/e 12/1898
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5662 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 65662 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J25
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2512/1898
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gateshead Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal Mon 06/06/1960
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1898
AUK West Auckland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51A Darlington 5w/e 17/12/1955
54A Sunderland m/e 21/07/1956
   Withdrawn on 06/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/07/1956
WDN   on 06/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1917 Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted
01/1917 Rebuilt with Piston Valves
08/1951 Diagram 67A boiler fitted
07/1954 Diagram 67B boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1988
Built at Gateshead Works
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted
   
01/1917 Modification Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted    
01/1917 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5662    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65662    
08/1951 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
07/1954 Modification Diagram 67B boiler fitted    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
06/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65662    

prev prev