Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 85 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 4750 Month
» 419071 Year
» 1640636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1992 m/e 12/1898
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5666 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 65666 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J25
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2512/1898
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gateshead Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal w/e Mon 04/07/1960
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1898
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1939
91N To North Eastern Region (Reinstated) (Reinstated for the war effort) m/e 11/1939
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) m/e 12/1939
91N To North Eastern Region (returned from loan) m/e 08/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 4w/e 19/07/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   w/e 04/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1928 Diagram "398" boiler fitted
10/1934 Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
09/1948 Diagram 67A boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811
29/01/1955 North eastern Miscellany No. 82028 Class 3 2-6-2T is at Bank Top, and No. 82026 is working the Kirby Stephen passenger job. They sent their J21s 65047 an 65092 to works last week (end of December). The first of the present order of Diesel 0-6-0 shunting engines, No. d13152, is on trial. Class J25 Nos. 65666 an 65698 have left works after complete overhaul, and J21s Nos. 65100, 65047, 65092, 65098 have been cut up. The last N.E.R. engine at Kirkby Stephen, J25 No. 65655, is now in store at Darlington. No. 65832, Class J27, while being run in ex-works at Bank Top loco, made a name for itself by careering from the shed area unattended, and running down the Up independent from Parkgate to Springfield, about 11 miles, where she ran into a dead end, and was derailed. The Parkgate signalman saw what was happening, and blocked the main lines, which saved what could have been a serious accident. The Derby-Newcastle excursion was worked by 45651 on 9th January.
During the first week of this year, the Croft goods branch was used for trials of the two types of Diesel shunters at West Hartlepool, with loads up to 500 tons. No. 11702 was one of the engines tried, and I believe the other was 11105. The N5 sent here for shops was sent in error, some mix up between the names Darnall and Darlington I have been told!
SLS/195503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1992
Built at Gateshead Works
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted
   
05/1928 Modification Diagram "398" boiler fitted    
10/1934 Modification Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted    
11/1939 Reinstated Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
12/1939 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD)    
08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5666    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
09/1948 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65666    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
04/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65666    

prev prev