Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1079 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18882 Week
» 71898 Month
» 191425 Year
» 3218278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1993 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5667 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65667 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 21/09/1954 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HLS |
Hull Springhead |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
52CHEX |
|
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1943 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
31/10/1954 |
Darlington Works |
Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. |
SLS/195412 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1993 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1943 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5667 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cudworth (CUD) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
17/03/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65667 |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
21/09/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65667 |
|
|