Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2044 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5683 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65683 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/06/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
08/1915 |
Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted |
07/1935 |
Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
07/1935 |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
08/1944 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2044 Built at Darlington Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
07/1935 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5683 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65683 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65683 |
|
|