Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2053 m/e 04/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5705 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 65705 on 16/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J25
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2504/1900
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Wed 27/10/1954
Service Life 54 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1900
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) m/e 03/1940
91N To North Eastern Region (returned from loan) m/e 01/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 4w/e 20/01/1951
54C Borough Gardens 5w/e 23/06/1951
   Withdrawn on 27/10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens w/e 23/06/1951
WDN   on 27/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1940 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1944 Diagram 67A boiler fitted
01/1948 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2053
Built at Darlington Works
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted
   
02/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD)    
04/1944 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5705    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65705    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
27/10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 65705    

prev prev