Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 96 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 4761 Month
» 419082 Year
» 1640647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2057 m/e 05/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5708 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 65708 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J25
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2505/1900
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1956
Service Life 56 yrs , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1900
DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50F Malton 4w/e 21/10/1950
51A Darlington 4w/e 15/11/1952
51F West Auckland 4w/e 23/01/1954
54A Sunderland 3w/e 12/11/1955
   Withdrawn on 28/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WBY Whitby w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 50F Malton w/e 01/10/1950
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   on 28/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1934 Diagram "398" boiler fitted
03/1941 Diagram 67A boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2057
Built at Darlington Works
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted
   
07/1934 Modification Diagram "398" boiler fitted    
03/1941 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5708    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65708    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
28/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 65708    

prev prev