|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1900 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 29 Built at Darlington Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
||
11/1939 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) | ||
01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5712 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65712 | ||
02/1949 | Modification | Diagram 67A boiler fitted | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
20/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
22/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65712 |