Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3103 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16509 Week
» 69525 Month
» 189052 Year
» 3215905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2073 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5698 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65698 |
on |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 15/09/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1947 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/01/1955 |
North eastern Miscellany |
No. 82028 Class 3 2-6-2T is at Bank Top, and No. 82026 is working the Kirby Stephen passenger job. They sent their J21s 65047 an 65092 to works last week (end of December). The first of the present order of Diesel 0-6-0 shunting engines, No. d13152, is on trial. Class J25 Nos. 65666 an 65698 have left works after complete overhaul, and J21s Nos. 65100, 65047, 65092, 65098 have been cut up. The last N.E.R. engine at Kirkby Stephen, J25 No. 65655, is now in store at Darlington. No. 65832, Class J27, while being run in ex-works at Bank Top loco, made a name for itself by careering from the shed area unattended, and running down the Up independent from Parkgate to Springfield, about 11 miles, where she ran into a dead end, and was derailed. The Parkgate signalman saw what was happening, and blocked the main lines, which saved what could have been a serious accident. The Derby-Newcastle excursion was worked by 45651 on 9th January. During the first week of this year, the Croft goods branch was used for trials of the two types of Diesel shunters at West Hartlepool, with loads up to 500 tons. No. 11702 was one of the engines tried, and I believe the other was 11105. The N5 sent here for shops was sent in error, some mix up between the names Darnall and Darlington I have been told! |
SLS/195503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2073 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1939 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
01/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5698 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65698 |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65698 |
|
|