Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3086 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16492 Week
» 69508 Month
» 189035 Year
» 3215888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2079 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5702 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65702 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/10/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1917 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
04/1917 |
Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted |
11/1932 |
Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
11/1932 |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
11/1942 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2079 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
|
|
11/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5702 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65702 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65702 |
|
|