Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17050 Week
» 70066 Month
» 189593 Year
» 3216446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2138 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5723 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65723 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/03/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
YK |
York (North) |
on |
09/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1939 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1939 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
11/1947 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2138 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1939 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1939 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/1940 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5723 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
11/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65723 |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65723 |
|
|