Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 383 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6310 Week
» 5048 Month
» 419369 Year
» 1640934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2141 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5726 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 65726 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J25
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2511/1902
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gateshead Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) m/e 02/1940
91N To North Eastern Region (returned from loan) m/e 03/1943
MID Middlesbrough on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51A Darlington 4w/e 21/04/1951
51J Northallerton 4w/e 20/10/1951
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 23/07/1955
50B Neville Hill 5w/e 14/06/1958
50D Starbeck w/e 11/04/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 19/09/1959
52A Gateshead w/e 24/09/1960
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 51J Northallerton w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 50D Starbeck 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 01/10/1960
WDN   on 18/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1936 Diagram "398" boiler fitted
01/1940 Diagram 67A boiler fitted
02/1940 Vacuum Ejector fitted
10/1945 Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
10/1945 Vacuum Ejector removed
03/1948 Diagram 67A boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2141
Built at Gateshead Works
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted
   
03/1936 Modification Diagram "398" boiler fitted    
01/1940 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
02/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD)    
02/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
10/1945 Modification Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted    
10/1945 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5726    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID)    
03/1948 Modification Diagram 67A boiler fitted    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65726    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (50D)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
18/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65726    

prev prev