Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 917 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5788 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65788 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Sun 05/06/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966
Service Life 60 yrs , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51A Darlington 4w/e 20/01/1951
51E Stockton 4w/e 17/02/1951
51L Thornaby w/e 20/06/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 07/04/1962
   Withdrawn on 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 51A Darlington m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 51E Stockton w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   on 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1945 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 917
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1945 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5788    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65788    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65788    

prev prev