Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 298 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6225 Week
» 4963 Month
» 419284 Year
» 1640849 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 938 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5789 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 65789 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
NBH Blyth (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) 4w/e 05/11/1966
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 05/11/1966
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1948 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
01/02/1964 Branch line news (Erecting Shop) Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April.
The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964.
SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. SLS/196403
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 938
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5789    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH)    
08/1948 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65789    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65789    

prev prev