Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1052 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5793 on 27/01/1946
British Railways 65793 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Thu 16/04/1959
Scrapping During 05/1959
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50A York (North) 4w/e 23/10/1954
50C Selby 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 16/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 16/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1952 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1052
Built at Darlington Works
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5793    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65793    
03/1952 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
16/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65793    

prev prev