Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 375 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6302 Week
» 5040 Month
» 419361 Year
» 1640926 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1227 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5795 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 65795 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Wed 12/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 60 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 27/03/1965
52F Blyth (North) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) 4w/e 05/11/1966
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
   Withdrawn on 12/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PMN Percy Main w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 27/03/1965
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 29/01/1966
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 05/11/1966
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   on 12/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1950 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Sunderland) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1227
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5795    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65795    
12/1950 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
12/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65795    

prev prev