Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 322 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6249 Week
» 4987 Month
» 419308 Year
» 1640873 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1044 m/e 06/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5826 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 65826 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L281
Works Number 18371
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal Wed 26/08/1959
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 51 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1908
PMN Percy Main on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52G Sunderland w/e 09/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 26/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PMN Percy Main on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 26/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1946 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1044
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18371
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5826    
07/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65826    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
26/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65826    

prev prev