Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 642 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5113 Week
» 16159 Month
» 16159 Year
» 1681535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1053 m/e 05/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5832 on 17/02/1946
British Railways 65832 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3354
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1909
Withdrawal Sun 27/03/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966
Service Life 56 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1909
PMN Percy Main on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) w/e 15/09/1962
52B Heaton w/e 29/09/1962
52F Blyth (North) w/e 11/05/1963
   Withdrawn on 27/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 04/03/1950
WDN   on 27/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1939 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901
29/01/1955 North eastern Miscellany No. 82028 Class 3 2-6-2T is at Bank Top, and No. 82026 is working the Kirby Stephen passenger job. They sent their J21s 65047 an 65092 to works last week (end of December). The first of the present order of Diesel 0-6-0 shunting engines, No. d13152, is on trial. Class J25 Nos. 65666 an 65698 have left works after complete overhaul, and J21s Nos. 65100, 65047, 65092, 65098 have been cut up. The last N.E.R. engine at Kirkby Stephen, J25 No. 65655, is now in store at Darlington. No. 65832, Class J27, while being run in ex-works at Bank Top loco, made a name for itself by careering from the shed area unattended, and running down the Up independent from Parkgate to Springfield, about 11 miles, where she ran into a dead end, and was derailed. The Parkgate signalman saw what was happening, and blocked the main lines, which saved what could have been a serious accident. The Derby-Newcastle excursion was worked by 45651 on 9th January.
During the first week of this year, the Croft goods branch was used for trials of the two types of Diesel shunters at West Hartlepool, with loads up to 500 tons. No. 11702 was one of the engines tried, and I believe the other was 11105. The N5 sent here for shops was sent in error, some mix up between the names Darnall and Darlington I have been told!
SLS/195503
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1053
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3354
   
10/1939 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5832    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65832    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
27/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 65832    

prev prev