Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 383 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6310 Week
» 5048 Month
» 419369 Year
» 1640934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1060 m/e 06/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5834 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 65834 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3356
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal Wed 24/05/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967
Service Life 57 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1909
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 24/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 24/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1942 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1060
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3356
   
02/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5834    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65834    
24/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65834    

prev prev