Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 336 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6263 Week
» 5001 Month
» 419322 Year
» 1640887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1061 m/e 07/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5835 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 65835 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3357
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 07/1909
Withdrawal Mon 23/01/1967
Scrapping During 03/1967
Service Life 57 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1909
HAV Haverton Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51L Thornaby w/e 21/02/1959
52F Blyth (North) w/e 12/01/1963
   Withdrawn on 23/01/1967
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 23/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1944 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1061
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3357
   
04/1944 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5835    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haverton Hill (HAV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65835    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
23/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65835    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev