Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1064 m/e 07/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5836 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 65836 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3358
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 07/1909
Withdrawal Mon 13/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 49 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1909
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 13/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 26/03/1949
WDN   on 13/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1952 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1064
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3358
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5836    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65836    
04/1952 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
13/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65836    

prev prev