Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 649 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5120 Week
» 16166 Month
» 16166 Year
» 1681542 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1065 m/e 09/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5837 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 65837 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3359
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 09/1909
Withdrawal Tue 30/10/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1909
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50G Whitby 4w/e 23/12/1950
50C Selby 5w/e 21/06/1952
50A York (North) 4w/e 23/10/1954
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 30/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1958 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1909 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1065
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3359
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5837    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65837    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
03/1958 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
30/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65837    

prev prev