Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1142 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18945 Week
» 71961 Month
» 191488 Year
» 3218341 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1065 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5837 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65837 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 03/1958 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1065 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3359 |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5837 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65837 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
03/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
30/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65837 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|