|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/12/1923 | 23/02/1924 | 59 days | Thorough | Tyres |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1925 | 05/09/1925 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1927 | 10/03/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1931 | 09/01/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | Left cylinder cracked |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 12 days | Light Repair | Boiler report |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tyres thin |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 38 days | Heavy | LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/11/1948 | 01/12/1948 | 16 days | Selective repairs | Renumbered |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 24 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1952 | 29/03/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1953 | 30/12/1953 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1956 | 10/08/1956 | 11 days | Non Classified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 26 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/01/1958 | 07/02/1958 | 18 days | Non Classified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1959 | 12/08/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1961 | 07/12/1961 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1213 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5110 |
||
1923 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thirsk (TSK) | ||
27/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Thorough) - Arr: 27/12/1923. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Tyres |
||
1925 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
09/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. | ||
24/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 10/03/1928. | ||
28/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 09/01/1932. | ||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. | ||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. | ||
01/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Left cylinder cracked |
||
07/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
30/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/10/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
10/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
10/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler report |
||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. Work undertaken: Tyres thin |
||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5846 | ||
06/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. Work undertaken: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Selective repairs) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 01/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered |
||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65846 | ||
1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8218 | ||
26/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
24/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. | ||
12/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1952. Dep: 29/03/1952. | ||
02/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1953. Dep: 30/12/1953. | ||
31/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 10/08/1956. | ||
13/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. | ||
21/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 21/01/1958. Dep: 07/02/1958. | ||
07/02/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8437 | ||
24/03/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8218 | ||
05/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1959. Dep: 12/08/1959. | ||
14/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. | ||
21/02/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: NER 3038g number 8215 | ||
09/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1961. Dep: 07/12/1961. | ||
15/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
28/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65846 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |