Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 353 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 5018 Month
» 419339 Year
» 1640904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2338 m/e 11/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5860 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65860 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1921
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51B Newport (Teeside) 5w/e 24/03/1951
51A Darlington 4w/e 17/11/1956
52F Blyth (North) w/e 10/10/1964
52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) w/e 18/02/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 52E Percy Main 5w/e 10/11/1962
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1942 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
07/1945 Superheater removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2338
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
07/1945 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5860    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65860    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65860    

prev prev