Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2342 m/e 12/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5864 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 65864 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/12/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 42 yrs , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1921
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 13/12/1952
52E Percy Main 4w/e 25/08/1956
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/10/1956
52F Blyth (North) w/e 05/08/1961
52B Heaton w/e 29/09/1962
52G Sunderland w/e 22/06/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 52E Percy Main 4w/e 18/08/1956
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 52FN   5w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 23/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1946 Superheater removed
05/1946 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2342
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
05/1946 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5864    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65864    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
25/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65864    

prev prev