Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 356 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6283 Week
» 5021 Month
» 419342 Year
» 1640907 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2347 m/e 04/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5869 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 65869 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 04/1922
Withdrawal Tue 14/02/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1922
TWD Tweedmouth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52G Sunderland w/e 05/08/1961
52B Heaton w/e 02/03/1963
52E Percy Main w/e 22/06/1963
52F Blyth (North) w/e 07/03/1964
52F Blyth (North) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth) 4w/e 05/11/1966
52G Sunderland 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 52B Heaton 3w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 52E Percy Main 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 05/11/1966
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 14/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1949 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
08/1956 Superheater removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2347
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5869    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD)    
12/1949 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65869    
08/1956 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (N.Blyth to S.Blyth)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65869    

prev prev