Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 323 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6250 Week
» 4988 Month
» 419309 Year
» 1640874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2348 m/e 05/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5870 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 65870 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1922
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1922
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 25/08/1956
51K Saltburn 4w/e 16/02/1957
51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 16/03/1957
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
52G Sunderland w/e 07/04/1962
52B Heaton w/e 23/02/1963
52G Sunderland w/e 22/06/1963
52F Blyth (North) w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 06/03/1948
ALLOC NBH Blyth (North) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 18/08/1956
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 52B Heaton 3w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 52FS   w/e 14/09/1963
WDN   on 12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1944 Superheater removed
04/1944 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2348
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1944 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
04/1944 Modification Modification: Superheater removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 5870    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65870    
25/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
12/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 65870    

prev prev